TN HB0611 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes enhanced sentences for crimes of force or violence committed while acting in concert. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As introduced, establishes enhanced sentences for crimes of force or violence committed while acting in concert. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-06 | Rec. for Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-12 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-11 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-10 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0926 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-12 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/13/2009
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0611&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0611.pdf |