TN HB0610 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, authorizes the commissioner of commerce and insurance to make available to healthcare providers on the department's website any prescribed claim form for reporting by healthcare providers. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, authorizes the commissioner of commerce and insurance to make available to healthcare providers on the department's website any prescribed claim form for reporting by healthcare providers. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 56; Title 68 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-12HouseAssigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee
2019-03-12HouseRef. to Insurance Committee
2019-02-07HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-02-04HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0348 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback