TN HB0595 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a lessee of private property who holds a disabled parking placard or plate to provide authorization to a towing firm to tow a vehicle that is parked in a disabled parking space without displaying a placard or plate, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 16 and Title 55, Chapter 21.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a lessee of private property who holds a disabled parking placard or plate to provide authorization to a towing firm to tow a vehicle that is parked in a disabled parking space without displaying a placard or plate, under certain circumstances. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 16 and Title 55, Chapter 21.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Beck [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-03-01 | House | Action Def. in s/c Transportation Subcommittee to 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-07 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0743 (Crossfiled) 2017-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation and Safety Committee