TN HB0568 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-02 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, broadens the definition of a "governmental entity" under the Tennessee Governmental Tort Liability Act to include a nonprofit public benefit corporation or charitable entity that is appointed by statute, ordinance, resolution, contract, or other governmental directive to develop, maintain, manage, and provide services and activities at government owned property that is a public park. - Amends TCA Section 29-20-102.
Title
As enacted, broadens the definition of a "governmental entity" under the Tennessee Governmental Tort Liability Act to include a nonprofit public benefit corporation or charitable entity that is appointed by statute, ordinance, resolution, contract, or other governmental directive to develop, maintain, manage, and provide services and activities at government owned property that is a public park. - Amends TCA Section 29-20-102.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-02 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 487 | |
2015-04-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-22 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-21 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-20 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Action Def. in s/c Local Government Subcommittee to 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Local Government Subcommittee for 3/18/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Local Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0332 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-02 - Pub. Ch. 487
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0568&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0568.pdf |