TN HB0542 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, increases from $1,000 to $1,250 the amount awarded each semester to a full-time student receiving the middle college scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, Part 9, relative to middle college scholarships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 529 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-26 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-26 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-02 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/2/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0009 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 529