TN HB0538 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 209
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions governing towing of vehicles and liens of garagekeepers and towing firms; expands the towing advisory board from nine to 11 members by adding a member appointed by the Tennessee Trucking Association and a member appointed by the American Car Rental Association. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 16 and Title 55, Chapter 23.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions governing towing of vehicles and liens of garagekeepers and towing firms; expands the towing advisory board from nine to 11 members by adding a member appointed by the Tennessee Trucking Association and a member appointed by the American Car Rental Association. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 16 and Title 55, Chapter 23.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 209 | |
2019-04-04 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-03-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/4/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/28/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Safety & Funding Subcommittee for 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Safety & Funding Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1493 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 209