TN HB0513 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Pub. Ch. 462
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the state to issue and sell bonds of up to $80 million.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the state to issue and sell bonds of up to $80 million.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 462 | |
2017-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2017 | |
2017-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-18 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-15 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-08 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed H., Ayes 82, Nays 3, PNV 0 |
2017-05-05 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0590) |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Appropriation Calendar for 5/4/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/3/2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0485 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 462