TN HB0513 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 421
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the board of trustees of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to delegate the responsibilities of operating and administering the retirement system to the state treasurer; revises other various provisions governing TCRS. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Title
As enacted, authorizes the board of trustees of the Tennessee consolidated retirement system to delegate the responsibilities of operating and administering the retirement system to the state treasurer; revises other various provisions governing TCRS. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 25; Title 8, Chapter 34; Title 8, Chapter 35; Title 8, Chapter 36 and Title 8, Chapter 37.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 421 | |
2015-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Reset on cal. for 4/20/15 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/8/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee--Finance |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-10 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1355 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-20 - Pub. Ch. 421
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0513&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0513.pdf |