TN HB0511 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes clerks to assess a transaction fee for electronic filing submitted by a party to a case in any court where electronic filing, signing, or verification of papers has been authorized by local court rule, and also approved by the supreme court, and is in compliance with technological standards established by the supreme court. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 19; Title 20; Title 21; Title 25; Title 37 and Title 40.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 19; Title 20; Title 21; Title 25; Title 37 and Title 40, relative to court procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Gino Bulso [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0708 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-02 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee