TN HB0494 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-14 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the Tennessee peace officer standards and training commission and LEAs to create a school patrol zone where local law enforcement shall patrol LEAs during the school week. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the Tennessee peace officer standards and training commission and LEAs to create a school patrol zone where local law enforcement shall patrol LEAs during the school week. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8; Title 38 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Re-refer to Civil Justice Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Re-refer to Civil Justice Committee (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-02 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Education Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE GOVERNMENT SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State Government Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-14 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-04-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/9/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed Behind the Budget |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/12/2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | Re-ref. Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2014-02-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/6/2014 |
2014-02-05 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 2/5/2014 |
2013-04-18 | House | Re-referred To: Civil Justice Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2013 |
2013-04-16 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-04-03 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-02 | House | Action Def. in Education Committee to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 4/2/2013 |
2013-03-19 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Education Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/19/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/13/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-04 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee-- Education |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0606 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-15 - Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk.