TN HB0494 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, exempts from sales tax the sale of motor vehicles to active duty members of the armed forces stationed in Tennessee but on temporary duty assignment in another state. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-303.
Title
As introduced, exempts from sales tax the sale of motor vehicles to active duty members of the armed forces stationed in Tennessee but on temporary duty assignment in another state. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-303.
Sponsors
Rep. Vince Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Withdrawn. | |
2011-04-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-02 | Placed on s/c cal Finance Subcommittee for 3/9/2011 | |
2011-02-16 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0469 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0494&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0494.pdf |