TN HB0471 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - Pub. Ch. 493
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the bureau of TennCare within the department of finance and administration to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 71.
Title
As enacted, extends the bureau of TennCare within the department of finance and administration to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29; Title 4, Chapter 3, Part 10 and Title 71.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Conference Committee Report (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR 2 MOTION TO ADOPT CONFERENCE COMMITTEE REPORT (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 76 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Pub. Ch. 493 | |
2019-05-29 | Effective date(s) 05/24/2019 | |
2019-05-24 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-05-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-05-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-05-09 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Conference Committee report adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar 3 for 5/1/2019 |
2019-05-01 | House | Conf. comm. report adopted, Ayes 93, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 5/1/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Conference Committee appointed. (Bell, Kyle, Roberts) |
2019-04-30 | House | Conf. comm. appointed (Daniel, M. Hill, Stewart) |
2019-04-30 | House | H. refused to recede from its non-concurrence |
2019-04-30 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar 3 for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate refused to recede from amendment 1 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-30 | House | H. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1 HB0471 |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (SA0428 - Senate Amendment 1) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Motion to reconsider adopted. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Tabling motion lifted. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Held on desk. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-04-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-04-22 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 76, Nays 15, PNV 1 |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0455) |
2019-04-22 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0423) |
2019-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/16/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-01 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0132 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 493