TN HB0466 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-01 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the annual report by the board of dentistry to be made by February 1 each year and sent to the general assembly, in addition to the governor. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 33; Title 49; Title 56; Title 63; Title 68 and Title 71, relative to health care.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Moody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0547 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-08 - Withdrawn.