TN HB0466 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 476
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes the state and local governments to provide health insurance benefits to the immediate family members of first responders killed in the line of duty for a period of two years after the death of the first responder; requires the state to reimburse local governments that provide such benefits. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes the state and local governments to provide health insurance benefits to the immediate family members of first responders killed in the line of duty for a period of two years after the death of the first responder; requires the state to reimburse local governments that provide such benefits. - Amends TCA Title 8, Chapter 27.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Pub. Ch. 476
2017-06-14 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-06-06 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-30HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-11HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-09SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2017-05-09SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0215)
2017-05-09SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0190)
2017-05-09SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-05-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-09HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 85, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-05-09HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0333)
2017-05-09HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0185)
2017-05-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-08HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-04-19HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2017
2017-04-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/26/2017
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-07HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-04HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-22HouseAction Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/29/2017
2017-03-20HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2017-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-06HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0822 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 476

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback