TN HB0456 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes the title of advance practice nurses to advanced practice registered nurses and changes references to their credentials from certificates to licenses; revises other provisions governing the practice of advanced practice nursing. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101; Section 49-2-124; Section 53-10-104; Section 53-10-302; Section 53-11-309; Section 56-32-137; Section 56-7-2408; Section 63-1-109; Section 63-1-301; Section 63-1-313; Section 63-10-217; Section 63-10-505; Section 63-10-506; Title 63, Chapter 29; Section 63-51-102; Section 63-6-244; Section 63-6-802; Title 63, Chapter 7; Section 63-9-121; Section 68-1-128; Section 68-11-224 and Section 71-5-1414.
Title
As introduced, changes the title of advance practice nurses to advanced practice registered nurses and changes references to their credentials from certificates to licenses; revises other provisions governing the practice of advanced practice nursing. - Amends TCA Section 24-9-101; Section 49-2-124; Section 53-10-104; Section 53-10-302; Section 53-11-309; Section 56-32-137; Section 56-7-2408; Section 63-1-109; Section 63-1-301; Section 63-1-313; Section 63-10-217; Section 63-10-505; Section 63-10-506; Title 63, Chapter 29; Section 63-51-102; Section 63-6-244; Section 63-6-802; Title 63, Chapter 7; Section 63-9-121; Section 68-1-128; Section 68-11-224 and Section 71-5-1414.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0680 (Crossfiled) 2016-02-17 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0456&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0456.pdf |