TN HB0453 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies additional acts that would constitute unfair trade practices by insurers and allows the insured to bring a civil cause of action against an insurer for violations of certain unfair insurance practices. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As introduced, specifies additional acts that would constitute unfair trade practices by insurers and allows the insured to bring a civil cause of action against an insurer for violations of certain unfair insurance practices. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | House | Withdrawn. |
2015-04-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee of Insurance and Banking Committee |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 4/1/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/25/2015 |
2015-02-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0389 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-31 - Failed in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0453&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0453.pdf |