TN HB0434 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that students having intellectual disabilities who are educated in comprehensive development classrooms be included as graduates when calculating the graduation rate for their high school class. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Title
As introduced, requires that students having intellectual disabilities who are educated in comprehensive development classrooms be included as graduates when calculating the graduation rate for their high school class. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2 and Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 60.
Sponsors
Rep. David Byrd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee of Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0518 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-12 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0434&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0434.pdf |