TN HB0421 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Pub. Ch. 91
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, increases existing fees, and adds additional fees, that an industrial loan and thrift company, industrial investment company, or industrial bank may charge to service various loans. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 45, Chapter 5, relative to industrial loan and thrift companies.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12 Pub. Ch. 91
2021-04-12 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-04-07 Signed by Governor.
2021-03-31HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-03-29SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-03-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-03-23HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-03-22SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 26, Nays 7
2021-03-22SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-03-11SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-03-08HousePassed H., Ayes 70, Nays 21, PNV 3
2021-03-04HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/8/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
2021-03-02HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/2/2021
2021-02-24HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Banking & Consumer Affairs Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Commerce Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0344 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-12 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 91

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback