TN HB0420 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the department of education to submit the annual report detailing the operation of the virtual education programs to the comptroller of the treasury. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires the department of education to submit the annual report detailing the operation of the virtual education programs to the comptroller of the treasury. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/28/2020 |
2020-03-18 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 3/18/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/4/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-25 | House | Action Def. in s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee to 3/3/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee for 2/25/2020 |
2020-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee |
2020-02-18 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0460 (Crossfiled) 2020-03-16 - Action deferred in Senate Education Committee