TN HB0419 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Right to Shop Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Tennessee Right to Shop Act." - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 33; Title 56; Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 407 | |
2019-04-30 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2019-04-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/30/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/29/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/24/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/23/2019 |
2019-04-08 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-02 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0510 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 407