TN HB0414 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Rcvd. from H., P1C.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the prohibition on the failure to wear a safety belt or receipt of a citation or warrant for arrest for failure to wear a safety belt being admissible into evidence in a civil action. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-604.
Title
As introduced, removes the prohibition on the failure to wear a safety belt or receipt of a citation or warrant for arrest for failure to wear a safety belt being admissible into evidence in a civil action. - Amends TCA Section 55-9-604.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-14 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-06 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CIVIL JUSTICE SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Civil Justice Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 91, Nays 5 |
2013-03-21 | House | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0149) |
2013-03-21 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0134) |
2013-03-14 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/21/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/13/2013 |
2013-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/6/2013 |
2013-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-13 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 2/27/2013 |
2013-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/13/2013 |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2013-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0119 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-19 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Jud Comm.