TN HB0409 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-10)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
Pending: House Civil Justice Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 9 @ 9:00 am in House Hearing Room II
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds information to be provided by the department of safety in a report detailing seizures for the previous calendar year and provided to the speakers of the senate and the house of representatives and the chairs of the appropriate committees; requires that an affidavit in support of a forfeiture warrant include information as to whether criminal charges have been filed against the owner of the property or the person in possession of the property at the time of seizure. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 33, relative to civil asset forfeiture.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-26HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0452 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback