TN HB0401 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a bus that is used exclusively for the transportation of students be registered as a passenger motor vehicle instead of a motor vehicle operating for hire. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, requires that a bus that is used exclusively for the transportation of students be registered as a passenger motor vehicle instead of a motor vehicle operating for hire. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 21 and Title 55, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-08 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2017-02-08 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee-- Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-02 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0450 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee