TN HB0393 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, expands the offense of theft to include new home construction contractors who fail to refund amounts paid under contract under certain circumstances or deviate from or disregard plans or specifications in any material respect that are contained in a new home construction contract. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, expands the offense of theft to include new home construction contractors who fail to refund amounts paid under contract under certain circumstances or deviate from or disregard plans or specifications in any material respect that are contained in a new home construction contract. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 14.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Pub. Ch. 310
2017-05-19 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-05-05 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-26HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-04-26SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2017-04-26SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0475)
2017-04-26SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-04-03SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-03-30HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-03-30HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2017-03-30HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-30HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0112)
2017-03-23HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/30/2017
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/23/2017
2017-03-15HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/15/2017
2017-03-07HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/7/2017
2017-02-17HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-08HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-06HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-02HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0780 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 310

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback