TN HB0393 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 350
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the emergency communications board, June 30, 2017; reconstitutes the board; requires the board's executive director to compile a report of the board's expenditures by item and revenue by source for the quarter prior to each board meeting, with the most recent report to be posted and prominently displayed on the board's web site each quarter. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 7, Chapter 86, Part 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, extends the emergency communications board, June 30, 2017; reconstitutes the board; requires the board's executive director to compile a report of the board's expenditures by item and revenue by source for the quarter prior to each board meeting, with the most recent report to be posted and prominently displayed on the board's web site each quarter. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 7, Chapter 86, Part 3.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-06 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 350
2015-04-20HouseComp. SB subst.
2015-04-17HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2015
2015-04-15HouseReset on cal. for 4/20/15
2015-04-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015
2015-04-07HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/7/2015
2015-03-31HouseAction def. in Government Operations Committee to 4/7/2015
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/31/2015
2015-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2015-02-09HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-04HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0211 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 350

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback