TN HB0393 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-05 - Assigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, adds to the definition of conduct unbecoming a teacher, for which a teacher may be dismissed, deliberately making false statements about competency and qualifications on application to teach and misrepresenting professional qualifications. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, adds to the definition of conduct unbecoming a teacher, for which a teacher may be dismissed, deliberately making false statements about competency and qualifications on application to teach and misrepresenting professional qualifications. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-05HouseAssigned to s/c Education Subcommittee
2013-02-04HouseP2C, ref. to Education Committee
2013-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-30HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0607 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-06 - P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback