TN HB0385 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Criminal Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-03 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Criminal Justice Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Deputy Jason Scott Public Safety Act," which makes it a criminal offense for a witness of a medical emergency to fail to immediately notify emergency services. - Amends TCA Title 38 and Title 39.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 38 and Title 39, relative to medical emergencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0633 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee