TN HB0385 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to conduct a study to determine the amount of insurance policies that provide benefits for neurological disorders and the amount of claims for treatment of autism spectrum disorder within such policies; requires the commissioner to report to the commerce committees no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires the commissioner of commerce and insurance to conduct a study to determine the amount of insurance policies that provide benefits for neurological disorders and the amount of claims for treatment of autism spectrum disorder within such policies; requires the commissioner to report to the commerce committees no later than January 1, 2020. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee of Insurance Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee for 3/11/2020 |
2019-02-06 | House | Assigned to s/c Life & Health Insurance Subcommittee |
2019-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0416 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-29 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee