TN HB0372 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits a government entity from requiring an employee of the entity to attend or participate in a training, seminar, or continuing education which the employee objects to on the basis of the person's morals, ethics, values, or religious beliefs. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7 and Title 8, relative to government employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service Subcommittee of State Government Committee
2021-03-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 3/17/2021
2021-02-24HouseAction Def. in s/c Public Service Subcommittee to 3/17/2021
2021-02-17HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/24/2021
2021-02-17HouseMeeting Canceled
2021-02-10HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service Subcommittee for 2/17/2021
2021-02-10HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service Subcommittee
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-21HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0193 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback