TN HB0355 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 324
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-05 - Pub. Ch. 324
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires law enforcement officer to conduct test to determine blood alcohol of driver involved in accident resulting in injury or death if officer has probable cause to believe driver committed DUI, vehicular homicide, or aggravated vehicular homicide; provides that test results may be offered as evidence in court or administrative hearing relating to accident or offense, subject to rules of evidence. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Title
As enacted, requires law enforcement officer to conduct test to determine blood alcohol of driver involved in accident resulting in injury or death if officer has probable cause to believe driver committed DUI, vehicular homicide, or aggravated vehicular homicide; provides that test results may be offered as evidence in court or administrative hearing relating to accident or offense, subject to rules of evidence. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-05 | Pub. Ch. 324 | |
2009-06-05 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-05-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-05-21 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-05-21 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-05-20 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-05-19 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-05-18 | Passed S., Ayes 32, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-18 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-04-30 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-04-27 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0 | |
2009-04-27 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0149) | |
2009-04-21 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 04/21/2009 | |
2009-04-14 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 04/14/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/1/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-05 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0534 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-05 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 324