TN HB0354 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends, from five to 10 business days, the time period in which an entity contracting with the comptroller of the treasury can file a written objection to an audit if the contracting entity contends that it is not subject to audit. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, extends, from five to 10 business days, the time period in which an entity contracting with the comptroller of the treasury can file a written objection to an audit if the contracting entity contends that it is not subject to audit. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 8 and Title 9.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-04HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-01-31HouseIntro., P1C.
2019-01-30HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0657 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback