TN HB0348 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires courts in making equitable division of marital property to consider all relevant evidence, including valuation methods typically used with regard to such assets without regard to whether the sale of the asset is reasonably foreseeable, in determining the value of an interest in a closely held business or similar asset. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, requires courts in making equitable division of marital property to consider all relevant evidence, including valuation methods typically used with regard to such assets without regard to whether the sale of the asset is reasonably foreseeable, in determining the value of an interest in a closely held business or similar asset. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 309 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-05 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-26 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0470) |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0102) |
2017-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0424 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 309