TN HB0340 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, entitles a construction design professional to compensation for additional services provided to certain state agencies that are not included in a basic services agreement; provides for the adjudication of disputes between construction design professionals and state agencies by an administrative law judge. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 62.
Title
As introduced, entitles a construction design professional to compensation for additional services provided to certain state agencies that are not included in a basic services agreement; provides for the adjudication of disputes between construction design professionals and state agencies by an administrative law judge. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 12, Chapter 4 and Title 62.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee |
2017-02-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/22/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0040 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-01 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee