TN HB0339 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the board of alcohol and drug abuse counselors, June 30, 2019, and clarifies that nominations from professional groups for appointment to the board are permissive. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 24, Part 6.
Title
As enacted, extends the board of alcohol and drug abuse counselors, June 30, 2019, and clarifies that nominations from professional groups for appointment to the board are permissive. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29, Part 2 and Title 68, Chapter 24, Part 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Pub. Ch. 6 | |
2015-04-01 | Effective date(s) 03/19/2015 | |
2015-03-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-03-18 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-09 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2015-03-05 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/9/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/5/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-04 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0218 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 6