TN HB0327 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-23 - Pub. Ch. 411
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, defines "foster care" and "foster parent" for purposes of provisions governing juvenile courts and proceedings; revises various provisions regarding permanency plans, foster care, and dependent and neglected children. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As enacted, defines "foster care" and "foster parent" for purposes of provisions governing juvenile courts and proceedings; revises various provisions regarding permanency plans, foster care, and dependent and neglected children. - Amends TCA Title 16; Title 17; Title 18; Title 34; Title 36; Title 37; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 4 BY Black (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 4 BY Black (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-23 | Pub. Ch. 411 | |
2009-06-23 | Effective date(s) 07/01/09 | |
2009-06-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-08 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-08 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-04 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-03 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-03 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 2, 3 & 4 Ayes 96, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-02 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 6/3/09 | |
2009-06-02 | S. adopted am. 4 | |
2009-06-02 | S. adopted am. 3 | |
2009-06-02 | S. adopted am. 2 | |
2009-06-02 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-05-28 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-05-26 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-05-26 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0 | |
2009-05-26 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - HA0626) | |
2009-05-26 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0593) | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/26/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-19 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/19/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 5/20/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Children and Family Affairs Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Children and Family Affairs Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-04-16 | Placed on s/c cal Domestic Relations of C&FA for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Assigned to s/c Domestic Relations of C&FA | |
2009-04-15 | Ref. to Children and Family Affairs Committee | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0859 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 411