TN HB0318 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Pub. Ch. 193
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, delays effective date of certain streamlined sales tax provisions until July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Title
As enacted, delays effective date of certain streamlined sales tax provisions until July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 67; Chapter 72 of the Public Acts of 2011; Chapter 273 of the Public Acts of 2015; Chapter 480 of the Public Acts of 2013; Chapter 530 of the Public Acts of 2009 and Chapter 602 of the Public Acts of 2007.
Sponsors
Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Pub. Ch. 193 | |
2017-05-03 | Effective date(s) 04/19/2017 | |
2017-04-19 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-10 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-21 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/20/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1208 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 193