TN HB0314 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, makes changes to the law regarding assignment of benefits to a healthcare provider; removes provisions of law relative to the collection of out-of-network charges by healthcare facilities. - Amends TCA Section 56-7-120 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 56-7-120 and Title 68, Chapter 11, Part 2, relative to billing of services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 42 | |
2023-02-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-02-23 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/27/2023 |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/23/2023 |
2023-02-21 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-02-15 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-14 | House | Action def. in Insurance Committee to 2/21/2023 |
2023-02-08 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance Committee for 2/14/2023 |
2023-02-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance Subcommittee for 2/7/2023 |
2023-01-30 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance Subcommittee |
2023-01-30 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance Committee |
2023-01-21 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0266 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-23 - Effective date(s) 03/14/2023