TN HB0312 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-01-27 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires TSAC to set a greater amount for the dual enrollment award per credit hour for courses taken at eligible four-year postsecondary institutions and certain eligible two-year postsecondary institutions than the amount of the award per credit hour for courses taken at eligible two-year postsecondary institutions. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.
Title
As introduced, requires TSAC to set a greater amount for the dual enrollment award per credit hour for courses taken at eligible four-year postsecondary institutions and certain eligible two-year postsecondary institutions than the amount of the award per credit hour for courses taken at eligible two-year postsecondary institutions. - Amends TCA Section 49-4-930.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Carr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-03-24 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Higher Education of ED of Education Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education of ED for 03/24/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Assigned to s/c Higher Education of ED | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Education | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-04 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0144 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-10 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0312&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0312.pdf |