TN HB0310 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the sentence a person who commits first degree murder as a minor is required to serve before becoming release eligible from 51 years to 25 years; applies to offenses committed on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, reduces the sentence a person who commits first degree murder as a minor is required to serve before becoming release eligible from 51 years to 25 years; applies to offenses committed on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 37; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2020 |
2020-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2020 |
2020-02-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2020 |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-04 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0069 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020