TN HB0303 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-25 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes the requirement that the commissioner of revenue disclose relevant, confidential information to the attorney general and reporter for the enforcement of the Tobacco Manufacturer's Escrow Fund Act. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, deletes the requirement that the commissioner of revenue disclose relevant, confidential information to the attorney general and reporter for the enforcement of the Tobacco Manufacturer's Escrow Fund Act. - Amends TCA Title 39; Title 43 and Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | House | Withdrawn. |
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0288 (Crossfiled) 2013-01-31 - P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0303&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0303.pdf |