TN HB0301 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies, in regard to the "retaliatory tax," relative to reciprocity of treatment by other states on Tennessee insurance companies doing business in that other state, that claims challenging liability must be brought in the chancery court of Davidson County pursuant to this state's general law provisions governing payment of tax under protest. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 56.
Title
As enacted, specifies, in regard to the "retaliatory tax," relative to reciprocity of treatment by other states on Tennessee insurance companies doing business in that other state, that claims challenging liability must be brought in the chancery court of Davidson County pursuant to this state's general law provisions governing payment of tax under protest. - Amends TCA Title 9 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423 | |
2017-05-08 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-03 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-02 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-06 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2017-02-02 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1189 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-23 - Pub. Ch. 423