TN HB0291 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 25
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, extends the Southwest Tennessee human resource agency to June 30, 2026. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 13, Chapter 26.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 13, Chapter 26, relative to the Southwest Tennessee human resource agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 25
2021-03-08HouseComp. SB subst.
2021-03-04HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021
2021-03-03HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/4/2021
2021-03-01HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-02-24HousePlaced on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/1/2021
2021-02-10HouseP2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee
2021-02-08HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-01-20HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0070 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-29 - Pub. Ch. 25

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback