TN HB0286 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-25 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-02-25 - Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, allows partisan elections for county executive of Rhea County. - Amends Chapter 322 of the Private Acts of 1978.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, allows partisan elections for county executive of Rhea County. - Amends Chapter 322 of the Private Acts of 1978.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Cobb [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Assigned to s/c Local Government of S&LG | |
2009-02-25 | Re-ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-23 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 2/25/09 | |
2009-02-23 | Objected to on Consent Calendar. | |
2009-02-19 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/23/09 | |
2009-02-11 | P2C held on desk. | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0090 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-11 - P2C held on desk. Local Bill
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0286&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0286.pdf |