TN HB0264 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-26 - Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases penalties for resisting arrest from Class B misdemeanor to Class A misdemeanor and from Class A misdemeanor to Class E felony if a deadly weapon is used in resisting the arrest; requires court to suspend defendant's driver license if motor vehicle is used as deadly weapon. - Amends TCA Section 39-16-602.
Title
As introduced, increases penalties for resisting arrest from Class B misdemeanor to Class A misdemeanor and from Class A misdemeanor to Class E felony if a deadly weapon is used in resisting the arrest; requires court to suspend defendant's driver license if motor vehicle is used as deadly weapon. - Amends TCA Section 39-16-602.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Watson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/01/2010 | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-04-01 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-03-25 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/01/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/25/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-02-17 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0189 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-13 - Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 5/19/2009
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0264&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0264.pdf |