TN HB0251 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-02-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires, rather than permits, motor vehicle officer investigating scene of accident to have parties exchange insurance information. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, requires, rather than permits, motor vehicle officer investigating scene of accident to have parties exchange insurance information. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 10, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-23 | Withdrawn. | |
2009-02-11 | P2C, ref. to Transportation | |
2009-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-01-28 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0301 (Crossfiled) 2009-03-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Trans. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0251&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB0251.pdf |