TN HB0242 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, prohibits the sale of food and beverages in certain containers containing bisphenol A; requires manufacturers to properly label the front of certain containers containing bisphenol A to warn "this package contains bisphenol A." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 53 and Title 68.
Title
As introduced, prohibits the sale of food and beverages in certain containers containing bisphenol A; requires manufacturers to properly label the front of certain containers containing bisphenol A to warn "this package contains bisphenol A." - Amends TCA Title 47, Chapter 18; Title 53 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-10 | House | Withdrawn. |
2013-01-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2013-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-29 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0698 (Crossfiled) 2013-03-20 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. H&W Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0242&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB0242.pdf |