TN HB0233 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-13 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes statutes on marriage licensing and ceremonies; limits the jurisdiction of circuit courts and chancery courts in cases involving the definition of common law marriage to the principles of common law marriage. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 10; Title 16; Title 36; Title 39; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 10; Title 16; Title 36; Title 39; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to marriage.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Leatherwood [R] | Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Rusty Grills [R] |
Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] |
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] | Rep. Paul Sherrell [R] | Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] |
Rep. Rick Eldridge [R] | Rep. Brandon Ogles [R] | Rep. Bruce Griffey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-04-13 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Civil Justice Committee |
2022-04-07 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-04-06 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/13/2022 |
2022-04-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-30 | House | Action def. in Civil Justice Committee to 4/6/2022 |
2022-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/30/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Action Def. in s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee to 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2022-03-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0562 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-28 - Sponsor(s) Added.