TN HB0217 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, specifies the continuing education credits required for persons acting as a bounty hunter; expands persons prohibited from serving as a bounty hunter in this state; and restricts clothing and representations of a professional bondsman. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 11, relative to bail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 520 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-13 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0261) |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-15 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0195) |
2021-04-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-10 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/17/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/10/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/24/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/17/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0219 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 520