TN HB0215 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows a court to order electronic tracking devices for first time violators of orders of protection; requires a court to order such devices for second and subsequent violations; all costs to be paid by the defendant. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Title
As introduced, allows a court to order electronic tracking devices for first time violators of orders of protection; requires a court to order such devices for second and subsequent violations; all costs to be paid by the defendant. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 3, Part 6; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 41.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-22 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 3/7/2012 | |
2012-02-15 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/22/2012 | |
2012-02-01 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 2/22/2012 | |
2012-01-25 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 2/1/2012 | |
2011-04-27 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 2012 | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-20 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/27/2011 | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-13 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/20/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-06 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/13/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Action Def. in s/c Judiciary Subcommittee to 4/6/2011 | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on s/c cal Judiciary Subcommittee for 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1328 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-24 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0215&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/HB0215.pdf |