TN HB0213 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-04 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes members of the board of veterinary medical examiners to be reappointed for successive terms; clarifies the definition of "veterinary facility" to be a building, place, or mobile unit from which the practice of veterinary medicine is conducted. - Amends TCA Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 68, Chapter 8.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63, Chapter 12 and Title 68, Chapter 8, relative to animal health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-04 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-05-04 | Pub. Ch. 926 | |
2022-04-29 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-04-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-04-07 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-04-07 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 82, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0213 |
2022-04-04 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/7/22 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0758) |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-29 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-28 | House | Passed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/16/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-15 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0257 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-04 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 926